Congregational constitution and brief historical record.
Congregational correspondence regarding a pastor's resignation.
10th anniversary brochure, congregational historical record.
A group photo of clergymen for the church dedication, from May 23rd, 1965.
The service of Formal Organization was held on April 17, 1955. From left to right: L.H. Steinhoff President of the Pacific Synod, Pastor Oscar V. Werner a retired Old Testament professor at Luthergiri Seminary in Rajahmundry, India and Pastor Waldmar G. Hintz Mission Developer.
A picture of the church interior, dedicated on May 23rd, 1965.
A picture from the 75th anniversary, on July 2nd, 1974. In the back from left to right: Paul Felver (1973-1976), Roland Wittrock (1949-1952), Robert Drewes (1952-1958), Theodore Meske(the son of the pastor from the 1920s-1930s). In the front: Karl Uper (bishop's assistant), Otto Ehlen (1941-1947), and Roy Johnson (1964-1967).
A picture of a church board announcing the formation of the new church. Pastor Dean W. Berg is in the photo, taken in 1967.
A picture showing Rev. Douglas Tliore receiving a gift for the Vehicle Fund, from the Lutheran Brotherhood. From October 7th, 1975.
A picture of the Galilean Chapel retreat center, from February 4th, 1975.